Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Morgan, Greg, Morgan, Jana Suzanne, Morgan, Andrew Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Haselhoff, Otto, against Whaley, Arthur Olin, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWallace, Arthur E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2005 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions155 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time213 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2006 | Hearing |
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money ACCT FOR ANDREW MORGAN, MINOR AND GAL JANA S MORGAN AMT OF $13908.23 TO BE IN BANK OF AMERICA |
|
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money ACCT FOR ANDREW MORGAN, MINOR AND GAL JANA S MORGAN AMT OF $13908.23 TO BE IN BANK OF AMERICA |
|
January 17, 2006 | Hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
January 11, 2006 | Hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on JANUARY 9, 2006, in Department 6, before the Honorable ARTHUR E WALLACE, pursuant to an Order to Appear to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 225. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ARTHUR E WALLACE Judge of the Superior Court |
|
January 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on JANUARY 9, 2006, in Department 6, before the Honorable ARTHUR E WALLACE, pursuant to an Order to Appear to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 225. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ARTHUR E WALLACE Judge of the Superior Court |
|
January 09, 2006 | Hearing |
NP4170 PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 225. Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 225. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. ************************************************************************************************** NO APPEARANCE IN OPPOSITION. CASE DISMISSED BY COURT WITH PREJUDICE. |
|
January 09, 2006 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
January 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO C.R.C. 225 Judge: Wallace, Arthur E |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.