Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Busby, Judy A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lahiri, Indra, against Beyerlein, Carla L, Buell, Katie Scott, Buell, Rebella Renee, represented by Strader, Patrick, Worthing, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWallace, Arthur E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time370 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2005 | Hearing |
NP4170 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. ************************************************************************************************** CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. CASE HAS BEEN DISMISS IN ITS ENTIRETY. |
|
January 04, 2005 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Wallace, Arthur E |
|
January 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
NP4170 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. ************************************************************************************************** CAUSE OFF CALENDAR. CASE HAS BEEN DISMISS IN ITS ENTIRETY. |
|
December 14, 2004 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
December 10, 2004 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY INDRA LAHIRI FOR PLAINTIFF *ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA AMS TO MICHAEL WORTHINGTON/LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL FRASHER |
|
December 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY INDRA LAHIRI FOR PLAINTIFF *ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA AMS TO MICHAEL WORTHINGTON/LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL FRASHER |
|
November 19, 2004 | Hearing |
NP1440 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JUDY A BUSBY (PL-1) APPEARS WITH INDRA LAHIRI. REBELLA RENEE BUELL (DE-1) APPEARS BY MICHAEL D WORTHING. KATIE SCOTT BUELL (DE-2) APPEARS BY MICHAEL D WORTHING. CARLA L BEYERLEIN (DE-3) APPEARS BY CHRISTOPHER J HAGAN. SETTLEMENT REACHED AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT REBELLA RENEE BUELL AND KATIE SCOTT BUELL TO PAY TO PLAINTIFF $6,808.00 AND DEFENDANT CARLA L. BEYERLEIN TO PAY TO PLAINTIFF $5,000.00 FOR A TOTAL SETTLEMENT OF 11,808.00. COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 1/3/2005. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 225 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 1/4/2005 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 6 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 12/20/2004 VACATED. |
|
November 19, 2004 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
November 19, 2004 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC & TRIAL 12-20-04 4 DAY TRIAL ESTIMATE Judge: Anspach, Robert J. |
|
November 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
NP1440 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JUDY A BUSBY (PL-1) APPEARS WITH INDRA LAHIRI. REBELLA RENEE BUELL (DE-1) APPEARS BY MICHAEL D WORTHING. KATIE SCOTT BUELL (DE-2) APPEARS BY MICHAEL D WORTHING. CARLA L BEYERLEIN (DE-3) APPEARS BY CHRISTOPHER J HAGAN. SETTLEMENT REACHED AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT REBELLA RENEE BUELL AND KATIE SCOTT BUELL TO PAY TO PLAINTIFF $6,808.00 AND DEFENDANT CARLA L. BEYERLEIN TO PAY TO PLAINTIFF $5,000.00 FOR A TOTAL SETTLEMENT OF 11,808.00. COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 1/3/2005. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 225 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 1/4/2005 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 6 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 12/20/2004 VACATED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.