Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWallace, Arthur E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2001 |
CategoryPersonal Injury-Motor Vehicle-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2008 | Hearing |
821 Pmt: Jury Forfeiture CCP 631.3 Amount of $150.00 for GOTHIC LANDSCAPING INC (CD-16). Received from COUNTY OF KERN, check no(s) 821. Receipt #372743 for amount of $150.00. |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
821 Pmt: Jury Forfeiture CCP 631.3 Amount of $150.00 for GOTHIC LANDSCAPING INC (CD-16). Received from COUNTY OF KERN, check no(s) 821. Receipt #372743 for amount of $150.00. |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
Accounting Withdrawal of forfeiture of Jury fees of $150.00 completed. |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Accounting Withdrawal of forfeiture of Jury fees of $150.00 completed. |
|
September 05, 2007 | Hearing |
186B Pmt: Ex Parte Application GC 26830(A)-(D) 10/15/02 Amount of $36.30 for BALCIUNAS, PETER (PL-1). Received from GORDON C. MEARS - 4/20/04. Receipt #336765 for amount of $36.30. |
|
September 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
186B Pmt: Ex Parte Application GC 26830(A)-(D) 10/15/02 Amount of $36.30 for BALCIUNAS, PETER (PL-1). Received from GORDON C. MEARS - 4/20/04. Receipt #336765 for amount of $36.30. |
|
June 28, 2006 | Hearing |
801C Pmt: First Appearance Civil EFF 8/17/03 Amount of $261.20 for KB HOME, (CC-1). Received from U.S AUDIOTEX. Receipt #251917 for amount of $261.20. |
|
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
801C Pmt: First Appearance Civil EFF 8/17/03 Amount of $261.20 for KB HOME, (CC-1). Received from U.S AUDIOTEX. Receipt #251917 for amount of $261.20. |
|
June 05, 2006 | Hearing |
801B Pmt: First Appearance Civil (1/1/03) Amount of $216.20 for TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC DBA LASCO BATHWARE (CD-22). Received from CD 22. Receipt #247114 for amount of $216.20. |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
801B Pmt: First Appearance Civil (1/1/03) Amount of $216.20 for TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC DBA LASCO BATHWARE (CD-22). Received from CD 22. Receipt #247114 for amount of $216.20. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.