We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Co Of Kern V Ladeira

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago ago

On March 13, 1989 a Child Support-Department Of Child Support Services case was filed by County Of Kern Dafs, Ladeira, Connie F, represented by against Ladeira, Daniel D, represented by in the jurisdiction of Kern County.

Case Details

Filing Date

March 13, 1989

Last Refreshed

November 21, 2021

Filing Location

Kern County, CA

Judge

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Child Support-Department Of Child Support Services

Practice Area

Family

Matter Type

Child Support

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Case History

Type Description
Hearing NP4163
Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND HALTH CARE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: COLIN GLENN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT DANIEL D LADEIRA (RE-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 4/6/2006 AT 8:30 AM IN DIVISION F.
Hearing 4163 Motion (DCSS)
New Calendar
Hearing Motion (DCSS)
CONT FROM 12/15/2005 RE: MOD C/S AND HEALTH CARE.

Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Hearing Rejection/Correction Notice
RETURNED REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING TO CONNIE LADEIRA - SHE SERVED HER OWN PAPERWORK
Hearing NP4163
Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND HEALTH CARE CALENDAR CALL WAS HEARD ON 12/15/2005. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: FABRICE DESBROSSES APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER SUBMISSION DANIEL D LADEIRA (RE-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 3/1/2006 AT 8:30 AM IN DIVISION F.
Hearing 4163 Motion (DCSS)
New Calendar
Hearing Order After Hearing
OAH 4/6/06 RE: C/S, RLM
Hearing NP4163
Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND HEALTH CARE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: COLIN GLENN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT DANIEL D LADEIRA (RE-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DANIEL D. LADEIRA TO PAY THE SUM OF $352.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 3/1/2006. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. SEE DISSOMASTER ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF.
Hearing 4163 Motion (DCSS)
New Calendar
Hearing Motion (DCSS)
CONT 03-01-06 RE: MOD CS AND HEALTH CARE

Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.