Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lindsey, Rose, County Of Kern Dafs, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lindsey, Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 1997 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2014 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List DISPOSITION DESTRUCTION EXHIBIT LIST |
|
March 20, 2014 | Hearing |
Order-Destruction of Exhibits 5 YEAR DESTRUCTION DISPOSITION |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List DISPOSITION DESTRUCTION EXHIBIT LIST |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order-Destruction of Exhibits 5 YEAR DESTRUCTION DISPOSITION |
|
March 18, 2005 | Hearing |
Order After Hearing RLM HEARING DATE: 02/23/2005 RESPONDENT WILL LIQUIDATE HIS ARREARS AT THE RATE OF $450.00 A MONTH COMMENCING 03/01/2005 THROUGH 12/31/2005. EFFEC TIVE 01/01/2006, RESPONDENT WILL RESUME LIQUIDATING HIS ARREARS AT THE RATE OF $663.00 A MONTH. |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing RLM HEARING DATE: 02/23/2005 RESPONDENT WILL LIQUIDATE HIS ARREARS AT THE RATE OF $450.00 A MONTH COMMENCING 03/01/2005 THROUGH 12/31/2005. EFFEC TIVE 01/01/2006, RESPONDENT WILL RESUME LIQUIDATING HIS ARREARS AT THE RATE OF $663.00 A MONTH. |
|
February 23, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1070 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION RE: EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: FABRICE DESBROSSES APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURT CALL BY ROSE LINDSEY IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JEFFREY SCOTT LINDSEY (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. SEE EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF FOR ITEMS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION OR ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PAYMENT ON ARREARS SHALL BE REDUCED TO $450.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 03/1/2005 THROUGH AND UP TO 12/31/2005. EFFECTIVE 01/01/2006 THE PRIOR ORDER FOR WITHHOLDING WILL BE IN EFFECT. |
|
February 23, 2005 | Hearing |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
February 23, 2005 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) REQUEST FOR HEARING REGARDING EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.