Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Professional Realty Management, A Partnership Consisting Of Thomas Meeks & Joshu, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hines-Johnson, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - More Than 12 Claims Within 12 Months |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions103 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time1274 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 10, 2008 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Dismissal Mailed to All Parties | |
November 05, 2008 | Hearing | Dismissed Without Prejudice | |
November 05, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
November 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial CONTINUED FROM 10⁄29⁄08 862.85 30⁄70 Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial CONTINUED FROM 10⁄29⁄08 862.85 30⁄70 Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
November 04, 2008 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
October 29, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROBIN SAWYER APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PROFESSIONAL REALTY MANAGEMENT. CYNTHIA HINES-JOHNSON (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CAUSE CONTINUED TO 11/5/2008 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 17 FOR FURTHER SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.