Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Publix Motors Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Powell, Ronnie L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,500 Or Less |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time667 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2010 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 27, 2008 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
October 24, 2008 | Hearing |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 14, 2008 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered WHAT RETURNED: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SMALL CLAIMS |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered WHAT RETURNED: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SMALL CLAIMS |
|
September 16, 2008 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties | |
September 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF; PRINCIPAL $219.00; COST $40.00 |
|
September 02, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: FRANK MCCORMACK APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT *************************************************************************************** FRANK MCCORMACK DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $219.00 COSTS 40.00 CANCELLED CONTRACT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.