Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Furniture Gallary Inc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Melero, Angel B, Jr., Ojeda, Tirza Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time1306 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents c |
|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents c |
|
February 27, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $2,500.00; COSTS: $96.00 AS TO TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA. CASE DISMISSED AS TO ANGEL B MELERO. CANCELED CONTRACT. PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT TO BE FORTHWITH CANCELED BEFORE THE JUDGMENT CAN BE ENFORCED. |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $2,500.00; COSTS: $96.00 AS TO TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA. CASE DISMISSED AS TO ANGEL B MELERO. CANCELED CONTRACT. PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT TO BE FORTHWITH CANCELED BEFORE THE JUDGMENT CAN BE ENFORCED. |
|
February 23, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROSA ALVAREZ APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT- ANGEL B MELERO JR. ROSA ALVAREZ DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. THE CASE AGAINST ANGEL B MELERO (DE-2) IS DISMISSED. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT -TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA FOR PRINCIPAL $2500.00 COSTS TO BE DETERMINE, AND PLUS CANCELED CONTRACT. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $50.00 ON 3/5/2006, PAY $50.00 OR MORE ON THE 5TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $2500.00 PLUS COST.. IT IS SO ORDERED: THE PLAINTIFF IS TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT TO BE FORTHWITH CANCELED BEFORE THE JUDGMENT CAN BE ENFORCED. |
|
February 23, 2006 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
|
February 23, 2006 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Palmer, William D. |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ROSA ALVAREZ APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR PLAINTIFF. TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT- ANGEL B MELERO JR. ROSA ALVAREZ DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. THE CASE AGAINST ANGEL B MELERO (DE-2) IS DISMISSED. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT -TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA FOR PRINCIPAL $2500.00 COSTS TO BE DETERMINE, AND PLUS CANCELED CONTRACT. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $50.00 ON 3/5/2006, PAY $50.00 OR MORE ON THE 5TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $2500.00 PLUS COST.. IT IS SO ORDERED: THE PLAINTIFF IS TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT TO BE FORTHWITH CANCELED BEFORE THE JUDGMENT CAN BE ENFORCED. |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
|
February 17, 2006 | Hearing |
Proof of Service AS TO TIRZA GARCIA OJEDA BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE; FEE: $10.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.