Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kephart, James L, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Cash, Johnny L, Holland, Tammie I, Rockway, Julie R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time1306 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
April 24, 2006 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO JULIE R ROCKWAY, NO FORWARDING ADDRESS PROVIDED. |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO JULIE R ROCKWAY, NO FORWARDING ADDRESS PROVIDED. |
|
March 27, 2006 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO TAMMIE I HOLLAND, FORWARDING ADDRESS PROVIDED, DOCUMENT FORWARDED |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO TAMMIE I HOLLAND, FORWARDING ADDRESS PROVIDED, DOCUMENT FORWARDED |
|
March 15, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $1,277.00; COST: $141.00, CANCELED CONTRACT, AS TO JOHNNY L CASH AND JULIE R ROCKWAY. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO TAMMIE I HOLLAND ONLY. |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties JUDGMENT: $1,277.00; COST: $141.00, CANCELED CONTRACT, AS TO JOHNNY L CASH AND JULIE R ROCKWAY. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO TAMMIE I HOLLAND ONLY. |
|
March 14, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAMES L KEPHART (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. THE CASE AGAINST TAMMIE I HOLLAND (DE-2) IS DISMISSED. WITHOUT PREJUDICE JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS-JOHNNY L. CASH, JULIE R ROCKWAY FOR PRINCIPAL $1277.00 COSTS TO BE DETERMINED PLUS CANCELED CONTRACT. |
|
March 14, 2006 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.