Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kephart, James L, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Meloche, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims - Conversion |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2009 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents C |
|
March 08, 2006 | Hearing |
Dismissed Without Prejudice no service |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice no service |
|
March 07, 2006 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
|
March 06, 2006 | Hearing |
Trial Date Vacated 3/7/06, 9AM, D-17 - NO SERVICE |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Trial Date Vacated 3/7/06, 9AM, D-17 - NO SERVICE |
|
January 13, 2006 | Hearing |
854A Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee-More than 12 Claims in 12 Amount of $66.00 for KEPHART, JAMES L DBA FRIENDLY CHECK CASHERS (PL-1). Received from HARRIET E SAGER, check no(s) 368. Receipt #219268 for amount of $66.00. |
|
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
854A Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee-More than 12 Claims in 12 Amount of $66.00 for KEPHART, JAMES L DBA FRIENDLY CHECK CASHERS (PL-1). Received from HARRIET E SAGER, check no(s) 368. Receipt #219268 for amount of $66.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.