Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herbert P Sears Co Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sims, Ronald S, against Barnes, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management155 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2682 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
January 14, 2010 | Hearing |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
December 24, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
December 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
December 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated CASE DISMISSED ~ calid=1040352 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4147, CourtDate:01/14/2010, Courtroom:14, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:1, SessionType:CTC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:paulada, SystemDate:6/9/2009 10:58:20 AM |
|
December 04, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1860 Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HERBERT P SEARS CO INC (PL-1) APPEARS BY RONALD S SIMS. KEITH BARNES (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE IS GRANTED. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. TRIAL/FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 01/14/10 VACATED. |
|
December 04, 2009 | Hearing |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
|
December 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Judge: Palmer, William D. |
|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
4041 Further Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.