Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Diamond Lakes, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Collins, Michael W, against Nix Demolition, An Unknown Entity; Richard Nix, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
December 21, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
September 21, 2009 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/DKR |
|
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/DKR |
|
September 02, 2009 | Hearing |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for DIAMOND LAKES (PL-1). Received from COLLINS ESQ, check no(s) 7086. Receipt #478082 for amount of $25.00. |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for DIAMOND LAKES (PL-1). Received from COLLINS ESQ, check no(s) 7086. Receipt #478082 for amount of $25.00. |
|
August 19, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Clerk JUDGMENT FOR: DIAMOND LAKES JUDGMENT AGAINST: NIX DEMOLITION, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; RICHARD NIX PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $ 1403.00 PREJUGMENT INTEREST: $ 96.48 ATTORNEY FEES: $ 0.00 COSTS: $ 325.00 TOTAL: $ 1848.69 SIGNED BY L HAMMOND |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Clerk JUDGMENT FOR: DIAMOND LAKES JUDGMENT AGAINST: NIX DEMOLITION, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY; RICHARD NIX PRINCIPLE/DAMAGES: $ 1403.00 PREJUGMENT INTEREST: $ 96.48 ATTORNEY FEES: $ 0.00 COSTS: $ 325.00 TOTAL: $ 1848.69 SIGNED BY L HAMMOND |
|
July 31, 2009 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W COLLINS RE: COMPUTATION OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST; WAIVER OF EXCESS INTEREST; WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES; WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST; & REQUEST FOR PRE-JUDGMENT COURT COSTS PER CCP 1033(b) FILED BY MICHAEL W COLLINS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.