Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Collect Access Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zee, Tappan, against Pearson, Richard G, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
December 03, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
June 22, 2009 | Hearing |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
May 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment by Default by Court DAMAGES: $12913.13 INTEREST: $3339.47 ATTORNEY FEES: $2186.96 COSTS $225.00 TOTAL: $18,664.56 |
|
May 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Declaration and Order RE COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; ETIENNE |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order RE COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS; ETIENNE |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Default by Court DAMAGES: $12913.13 INTEREST: $3339.47 ATTORNEY FEES: $2186.96 COSTS $225.00 TOTAL: $18,664.56 |
|
April 22, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RE: COURT JUDGMENT - NEED ORIGINAL WRITTEN CONTRACT (CRC RULE 3.1806) IF CONTRACT NOT AVAILABLE, NEED DECLARATION & ORDER TO ACCEPT COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.