Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman, Randall D, against Rodriguez, Francisco, represented by Roth, Mitchell W, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Katz, Steven M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatz, Steven M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2627 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
April 30, 2009 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
April 02, 2009 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (PL-1). Received from NAIMAN LAW GROUP, check no(s) 81923. Receipt #448191 for amount of $15.00. |
|
April 02, 2009 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued FORWARDED TO KCSO WITH SHERIFF INSTRUCTION AND CHECK # 84470 |
|
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued FORWARDED TO KCSO WITH SHERIFF INSTRUCTION AND CHECK # 84470 |
|
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (PL-1). Received from NAIMAN LAW GROUP, check no(s) 81923. Receipt #448191 for amount of $15.00. |
|
March 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment AFTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE ****SIGNED BY JUDGE KATZ**** |
|
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment AFTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE ****SIGNED BY JUDGE KATZ**** |
|
February 25, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED 2/8 JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR WRIT, WRIT & CHECK # 81923. JUDGMENT NOT A PROPER FILING. MUST BE JUDGMENT ON PLEADING VIA FEDEX |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED 2/8 JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR WRIT, WRIT & CHECK # 81923. JUDGMENT NOT A PROPER FILING. MUST BE JUDGMENT ON PLEADING VIA FEDEX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.