Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Haro, Saul, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Alcala, Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Katz, Steven M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatz, Steven M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2627 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
February 24, 2009 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied | |
February 05, 2009 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for HARO, SAUL (PL-1). Received from UNITED COMPANIES INCORPORATED, check no(s) 7786. Receipt #437173 for amount of $15.00. |
|
February 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA TRI STAR |
|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA TRI STAR |
|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for HARO, SAUL (PL-1). Received from UNITED COMPANIES INCORPORATED, check no(s) 7786. Receipt #437173 for amount of $15.00. |
|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR: SAUL HARO JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANCISCO ALCALA RENT/DAMAGES: $ 1950.64 ATTORNEY FEES: $0 COSTS: $ PURSUANT TO MEMO OF COST LATE FEES: $75.00 INTEREST: $0 TOTAL: $2025.64 *******SIGNED BY JUDGE LEWIS******** JUDGMENT MAILED: 2/5/09 |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR: SAUL HARO JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANCISCO ALCALA RENT/DAMAGES: $ 1950.64 ATTORNEY FEES: $0 COSTS: $ PURSUANT TO MEMO OF COST LATE FEES: $75.00 INTEREST: $0 TOTAL: $2025.64 *******SIGNED BY JUDGE LEWIS******** JUDGMENT MAILED: 2/5/09 |
|
January 29, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: SAUL HARO (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. FRANCISCO ALCALA (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANT, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $1950.64, COSTS $PER MEMORANDUM OF COST, ATTORNEY FEES $-0-, MISC FEES $75.00 ( LATE FEE) FOR A TOTAL OF $2025.64. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. THE COURT TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
January 29, 2009 | Hearing |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.