Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffman, Martin, against Mahler, Daniel R., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time2424 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 15, 2009 | Hearing |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARTIN HOFFMAN ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. UPON THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. |
|
September 15, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTC WITH 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTC WITH 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARTIN HOFFMAN ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. UPON THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. |
|
September 14, 2009 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
August 21, 2009 | Hearing | Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause | |
July 16, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO BE PAID BY /STAYED (30) DAYS (UNTIL 08/17/09) IF IN COMPLIANCE SANCTIONS WAIVED IF NOT DUE AND PAYABLE ON 08/18/09. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740. HEARING SET 9/15/2009 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.