Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffman, Martin, against Bustamante, Sylviana, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management169 days |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2424 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 16, 2009 | Hearing |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 14, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
June 12, 2009 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
April 29, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
|
April 29, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice of Change Name/Address FILED BY MARTIN HOFFMANN, ESQ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.