Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Dennis, Byron, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time2436 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 13, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
April 28, 2009 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
April 15, 2009 | Hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; DECLARATION OF JURISDICTIONAL FACTS; STATEMENT OF LOCATION; NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT WHO SERVED: BYRON DENNIS HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 08/22/08 FEE FOR SERVICE: $76.00 |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; DECLARATION OF JURISDICTIONAL FACTS; STATEMENT OF LOCATION; NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT WHO SERVED: BYRON DENNIS HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 08/22/08 FEE FOR SERVICE: $76.00 |
|
March 20, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.