Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Gomes, Eva K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management166 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2436 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement Returned MSC BRIEF |
|
March 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement Returned MSC BRIEF |
|
August 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal AND PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal AND PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION |
|
July 23, 2009 | Hearing |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
4147 Court Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 17, 2009 | Hearing |
839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 Amount of $3.00 for CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from RORY W. CLARK. Receipt #469107 for amount of $3.00. Detail: FAX FILING SEQUENCE NUMBER: 879002967 07/15/2009 POSTED 07/17/2009 AJ.. |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 Amount of $3.00 for CHASE BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from RORY W. CLARK. Receipt #469107 for amount of $3.00. Detail: FAX FILING SEQUENCE NUMBER: 879002967 07/15/2009 POSTED 07/17/2009 AJ.. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.