Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Financial Credit Network Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gubler, E Warren, against Plunkett, Randy D, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management166 days |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2437 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 15, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
March 27, 2009 | Hearing |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction BY E. WARREN GUBLER |
|
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction BY E. WARREN GUBLER |
|
March 20, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice A JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED INTO ON THIS CASE. CIVIL CLERK ALONE CANNOT PROCESS YOUR DISMISSAL IN THIS STATUS (MAILED VIA SASE) |
|
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice A JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED INTO ON THIS CASE. CIVIL CLERK ALONE CANNOT PROCESS YOUR DISMISSAL IN THIS STATUS (MAILED VIA SASE) |
|
February 04, 2009 | Hearing |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.