Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beneficial California Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffman, Martin, against Stewart, Sebrina, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time2432 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 22, 2009 | Hearing |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARTIN HOFFMAN ON BEHALF OF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. UPON THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. |
|
September 22, 2009 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
September 22, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA RE SANCTIONS AS TO PLT COUNSEL FTC WITH CRC 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA RE SANCTIONS AS TO PLT COUNSEL FTC WITH CRC 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MARTIN HOFFMAN ON BEHALF OF BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. UPON THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. |
|
August 21, 2009 | Hearing | Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause | |
July 22, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO BE PAID BY /STAYED (30) DAYS (UNTIL 8/25/09) IF IN COMPLIANCE SANCTIONS WAIVED IF NOT DUE AND PAYABLE ON 8/26/09. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740. HEARING SET 9/22/2009 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.