Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Apodaca, Ysabel G, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
February 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied AS TO YSABEL G APODACA |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied AS TO YSABEL G APODACA |
|
July 20, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
February 09, 2009 | Hearing |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
January 23, 2009 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, check no(s) 116937. Receipt #434593 for amount of $15.00. |
|
January 23, 2009 | Hearing |
117A Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) Amount of $15.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, check no(s) 116937. Receipt #434568 for amount of $15.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.