Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mancilla, Martin, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Coleman, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2423 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 26, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for MANCILLA, MARTIN (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEYS MESSENGER SERVICE, check no(s) 4794. Receipt #413080 for amount of $15.00. |
|
September 26, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued | |
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for MANCILLA, MARTIN (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEYS MESSENGER SERVICE, check no(s) 4794. Receipt #413080 for amount of $15.00. |
|
September 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Stipulation AND AGREEMENT WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 10/04/2008. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $200.00 ON 12/3/2008, PAY $200.00 OR MORE ON THE 3RD OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $1400.00 WITH NO GRACE PERIOD. THE DEFENDANT AGREES TO VACATE ON OCTOBER 3 2008 BY 6 P.M. THE UNIT WILL BE LEFT CLEAN. MR. MANCILLA WILL BE THERE AT 6 P.M. TO COLLECT APARTMENT AND MAILBOX KEYS. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE AGREEMENT, THEN UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT $2800.00 LESS ANY CREDITS . PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION SUBMITTED TO INCLUDE PROOF OF SERVICE OF MAILING COPY OF DEFAULT TO DEFAULTING PARTY STATING THAT THE PAYMENTS HAVE NOT BEEN MADE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH RIGHT IN THE EVENT OF DEFAULT OF STIPULATED AGREEMENT TO FILE DECLARATION TO HAVE PROCEEDINGS REINSTATED AND JUDGMENT ENTERED. ***SIGNED BY COMM ERREA*** |
|
September 02, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. MARTIN MANCILLA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. KIMBERLY COLEMAN (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION STIPULATED AGREEMENT ON FILE HEREIN MADE AN ORDER OF THE COURT. MEDIATOR: MARISOL AGUIRRE WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 10/04/2008. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $200.00 ON 12/3/2008, PAY $200.00 OR MORE ON THE 3RD OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $1400.00 WITH NO GRACE PERIOD. THE DEFENDANT AGREES TO VACATE ON OCTOBER 3 2008 BY 6 P.M. THE UNIT WILL BE LEFT CLEAN. MR. MANCILLA WILL BE THERE AT 6 P.M. TO COLLECT APARTMENT AND MAILBOX KEYS. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE AGREEMENT, THEN UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT $2800.00 LESS ANY CREDITS . PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION SUBMITTED TO INCLUDE PROOF OF SERVICE OF MAILING COPY OF DEFAULT TO DEFAULTING PARTY STATING THAT THE PAYMENTS HAVE NOT BEEN MADE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH RIGHT IN THE EVENT OF DEFAULT OF STIPULATED AGREEMENT TO FILE DECLARATION TO HAVE PROCEEDINGS REINSTATED AND JUDGMENT ENTERED. |
|
September 02, 2008 | Hearing |
4154 Unlawful Detainer Trial New Calendar |
|
September 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)
Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
September 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
4154 Unlawful Detainer Trial New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.