Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Preferred Realty Advisors, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Colon, Maribel, Luna, Leonardo, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2424 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 17, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
September 12, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for PREFERRED REALTY ADVISORS, INC. (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 1501. Receipt #410018 for amount of $15.00. |
|
September 12, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued | |
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for PREFERRED REALTY ADVISORS, INC. (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 1501. Receipt #410018 for amount of $15.00. |
|
September 10, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial UPON THE PLAINTIFF ORAL MOTION THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY AMENDED THE ADDRESS TO 2141 HOLLY AVENUE # A IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS. PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES, COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND MISCELLANEOUS FEES. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 5 P.M. ON 09/19/2008 |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial UPON THE PLAINTIFF ORAL MOTION THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY AMENDED THE ADDRESS TO 2141 HOLLY AVENUE # A IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS. PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES, COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND MISCELLANEOUS FEES. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 5 P.M. ON 09/19/2008 |
|
August 28, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: PREFERRED REALTY ADVISORS, INC. (PL-1) APPEARS BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK. MARIBEL COLON (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. LEONARDO LUNA (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. UPON THE PLAINTIFF ORAL MOTION THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY AMENDED THE ADDRESS TO 2141 HOLLY AVENUE # A IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS. PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES, COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND MISCELLANEOUS FEES. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 5 P.M. ON 09/19/2008. PLAINTIFF COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
August 28, 2008 | Hearing |
4154 Unlawful Detainer Trial New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.