Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jimenez, Juana, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Wandick, Karon, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 17, 2008 | Hearing | Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
August 22, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for JIMENEZ, JUANA DBA EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT (PL-1). Received from EFFECTIVE PROPERTY RECOVERY, check no(s) 22943. Receipt #405596 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for JIMENEZ, JUANA DBA EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT (PL-1). Received from EFFECTIVE PROPERTY RECOVERY, check no(s) 22943. Receipt #405596 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 21, 2008 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD |
|
August 21, 2008 | Hearing | Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit | |
August 21, 2008 | Hearing | Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered | |
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD |
|
August 07, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered KARON WANDICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.