Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cook, Dan, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Erwin, William Taplan, Iv, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 18, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
August 22, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for COOK, DAN DBA INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA EQUITY 1-LOANS (PL-1). Received from SANDRA HUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 1209. Receipt #405554 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for COOK, DAN DBA INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA EQUITY 1-LOANS (PL-1). Received from SANDRA HUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 1209. Receipt #405554 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 21, 2008 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD |
|
August 21, 2008 | Hearing | Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit | |
August 21, 2008 | Hearing | Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered | |
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD |
|
August 12, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered AS TO WILLIAM TAPLAN ERWIN IV AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.