Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association As Trustee For Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificat, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Naiman, Randall D, against Soto, Magdalena, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 30, 2009 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
September 17, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Vacated - Default Judgment Entered DISMISSAL FILED 9/11/09 |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Vacated - Default Judgment Entered DISMISSAL FILED 9/11/09 |
|
September 11, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY RANDALL D NAIMAN ESQ |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY RANDALL D NAIMAN ESQ |
|
August 31, 2009 | Hearing |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause Docket notice after edit reverting from draft to final. NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON SEPTEMBER 30, 2009 AT 2:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LORNA H BRUMFIELD Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON SEPTEMBER 30, 2009 AT 2:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LORNA H BRUMFIELD Judge of the Superior Court |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause Docket notice after edit reverting from draft to final. NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON SEPTEMBER 30, 2009 AT 2:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LORNA H BRUMFIELD Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON SEPTEMBER 30, 2009 AT 2:30PM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LORNA H BRUMFIELD Judge of the Superior Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.