Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lobel Financial Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lobel, Gary D, against Bell, Dematrie A., Villapando, Jose R., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2460 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 23, 2012 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied KERN COUNTY. |
|
October 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied KERN COUNTY. |
|
July 23, 2010 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
March 24, 2009 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
December 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO DEMATRIE A. BELL: 11/24/08 MINUTE ORDER NOTICE; UNABLE TO FORWARD. |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO DEMATRIE A. BELL: 11/24/08 MINUTE ORDER NOTICE; UNABLE TO FORWARD. |
|
November 24, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1765 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF DEMATRIE A BELL ONLY. AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR THIS MINUTE ORDER AMENDED ON 12/2/2008 BY SAHRI SEIBOLD TO CORRECT INFORMATION REGARDING RELEASE OF FUNDS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION IS DENIED. LEVY NUMBER 2008071459. CERTIFIED COPY OF THE ORDER TO THE SHERIFF. COPY OF THE ORDER TO NAMED PARTIES. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT OF THE JUDGMENT. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.