Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gonsalves, Kevin, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Scully, Cynthia R, against Meeker, Tammy, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2454 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 23, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
May 08, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for GONSALVES, KEVIN (PL-1). Received from CYNTHIA R SCULLY, check no(s) 3633. Receipt #386560 for amount of $15.00. |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for GONSALVES, KEVIN (PL-1). Received from CYNTHIA R SCULLY, check no(s) 3633. Receipt #386560 for amount of $15.00. |
|
May 05, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued | |
May 02, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment After Hearing PAST DUE RENT: $1120.00 HOLD-OVER DAMAGES: $513.24 ATTORNEY FEE: $00.00 COSTS: $235.00 LATE FEE: $00.00 MISCELLANEOUS: $00.00 TOTAL JUDGMENT: $1,868.24 SIGNED BY COMM ERREA |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment After Hearing PAST DUE RENT: $1120.00 HOLD-OVER DAMAGES: $513.24 ATTORNEY FEE: $00.00 COSTS: $235.00 LATE FEE: $00.00 MISCELLANEOUS: $00.00 TOTAL JUDGMENT: $1,868.24 SIGNED BY COMM ERREA |
|
April 29, 2008 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs and Credits FILING FEE: $195.00 SERVICE: $ 40.00 TOTAL: $ 235.00 |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs and Credits FILING FEE: $195.00 SERVICE: $ 40.00 TOTAL: $ 235.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.