Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pioneer Pines Mobilehome Park, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Trevillyan, Jonathan T, against Reyes, Victor M, Trejo, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2505 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 21, 2008 | Hearing |
107C Pmt: Motion for Summary Judgment GC 70617(D) 1/1/06 Receipt #379657 entered by Deputy #543 on 04/03/2008 3:48:18 PM in the amount of $200.00 voided due to CLERICAL ERROR; voided by Deputy #33 on 07/21/2008 at 8:09:15 AM with void transaction #399389. |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
107C Pmt: Motion for Summary Judgment GC 70617(D) 1/1/06 Receipt #379657 entered by Deputy #543 on 04/03/2008 3:48:18 PM in the amount of $200.00 voided due to CLERICAL ERROR; voided by Deputy #33 on 07/21/2008 at 8:09:15 AM with void transaction #399389. |
|
July 16, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
June 05, 2008 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for PIONEER PINES MOBILEHOME PARK (PL-1). Received from JONATHAN T TREVILLYAN, check no(s) 11744. Receipt #391380 for amount of $15.00. |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for PIONEER PINES MOBILEHOME PARK (PL-1). Received from JONATHAN T TREVILLYAN, check no(s) 11744. Receipt #391380 for amount of $15.00. |
|
June 04, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued | |
June 04, 2008 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial PAST DUE RENT: $3574.86 HOLD-OVER DAMAGES: $ ATTORNEY FEE: $ COSTS: $535.00 LATE FEE: $ TOTAL JUDGMENT: $4109.86 SIGNED BY COMM ERREA |
|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial PAST DUE RENT: $3574.86 HOLD-OVER DAMAGES: $ ATTORNEY FEE: $ COSTS: $535.00 LATE FEE: $ TOTAL JUDGMENT: $4109.86 SIGNED BY COMM ERREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.