Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
White Lane Plaza Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Jackson, David, Jackson, Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
Category31-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Commercial - Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2505 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: WHITE LANE PLAZA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PL-1) APPEARS BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK ESQ. ATTORNEY ROGER LAMPKIN MAKES SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR/WITH DEFENDANTS-DAVID JACKSON (DE-1), YVONNE JACKSON (DE-2). PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. THE DEFENDANTS HAVE AGREED TO PAY THE PLAINTIFF THE TOTAL SUM OF $ 25034.09. PAYMENTS AS FOLLOWS: $ 15,034.09 BY 5 P.M. ON 02/21/2008, THE REMAINING BALANCE OF $10,000.00 TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: $1,000.00 ON 03/15/2008, PAY $1000.00 ON THE 15 TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID. THE DEFENDANTS PAY THE CURRENT RENT. THE DEFENDANTS WILL REMAIN IN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO SET ASIDE THE DISMISSAL. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE AGREEMENT, THEN UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT $25034.09 LESS ANY CREDITS AND WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. IF THE DEFENDANTS DO COMPLY WITH THE PAYMENT AGREEMENT, THE PLAINTIFF WILL FILE A DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
|
February 20, 2008 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)
Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: WHITE LANE PLAZA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (PL-1) APPEARS BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK ESQ. ATTORNEY ROGER LAMPKIN MAKES SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR/WITH DEFENDANTS-DAVID JACKSON (DE-1), YVONNE JACKSON (DE-2). PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. THE DEFENDANTS HAVE AGREED TO PAY THE PLAINTIFF THE TOTAL SUM OF $ 25034.09. PAYMENTS AS FOLLOWS: $ 15,034.09 BY 5 P.M. ON 02/21/2008, THE REMAINING BALANCE OF $10,000.00 TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: $1,000.00 ON 03/15/2008, PAY $1000.00 ON THE 15 TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID. THE DEFENDANTS PAY THE CURRENT RENT. THE DEFENDANTS WILL REMAIN IN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. WITH THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO SET ASIDE THE DISMISSAL. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE AGREEMENT, THEN UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT $25034.09 LESS ANY CREDITS AND WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. IF THE DEFENDANTS DO COMPLY WITH THE PAYMENT AGREEMENT, THE PLAINTIFF WILL FILE A DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
|
February 04, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Trial New Notice |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial New Notice |
|
January 30, 2008 | Hearing |
Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) NOT AVAILABLE FEB 6, 2008; FEB 21, 2008; FEB 26, 2008; FEB 27, 2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.