Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The National Collection Agency Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Keeperman, Fred, against Reynoso, Andres, Rodriguez, Irene, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etcheverry, Louis P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtcheverry, Louis P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2003 |
Category06-Cl >10K <25K Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 20, 2005 | Hearing |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction AND RECORDED ON ANDRES REYNOSO AND IRENE RODRIGUEZ |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction AND RECORDED ON ANDRES REYNOSO AND IRENE RODRIGUEZ |
|
June 23, 2005 | Hearing |
117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 Amount of $7.00 for THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC (PL-1). Received from NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, check no(s) 71205. Receipt #176264 for amount of $7.00. |
|
June 23, 2005 | Hearing |
Abstract Issued MAILED |
|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract Issued MAILED |
|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 Amount of $7.00 for THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC (PL-1). Received from NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, check no(s) 71205. Receipt #176264 for amount of $7.00. |
|
November 03, 2004 | Hearing | Writ Returned Partially Satisfied | |
April 23, 2004 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC (PL-1). Received from KEPPERMAN ESQ. Receipt #92280 for amount of $7.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.