Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Aguilar, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Louie L. Vega presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouie L. Vega Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2011 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 08, 2005 | Hearing | Writ Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
September 15, 2004 | Hearing | Exhibit(s) Ordered Destroyed | |
July 07, 2004 | Hearing | Not Prop Disp Civil Case Exhibits | |
July 02, 2004 | Hearing | Order for Return of Exhibits | |
March 24, 2004 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
December 18, 2003 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES (AS-1). Received from COLLECTIBLES MGMT. Receipt #68144 for amount of $7.00. |
|
December 18, 2003 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/ DKR |
|
December 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES (AS-1). Received from COLLECTIBLES MGMT. Receipt #68144 for amount of $7.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.