Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credamerica Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Carlson, John D, against Contreras, Robin, Contreras, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 1998 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2011 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
March 10, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice of Change Name/Address BY JOHN D. CARLSON |
|
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change Name/Address BY JOHN D. CARLSON |
|
September 18, 2008 | Hearing |
188C Pmt: App/Renewal Judgment GC 70626(B) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $20.00 for CREDAMERICA INC (PL-1). Received from JOHN D CARLSON, check no(s) 6325. Receipt #411471 for amount of $20.00. |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
188C Pmt: App/Renewal Judgment GC 70626(B) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $20.00 for CREDAMERICA INC (PL-1). Received from JOHN D CARLSON, check no(s) 6325. Receipt #411471 for amount of $20.00. |
|
September 12, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned with Service WHAT SERVED:APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT WHO SERVED:SAMUEL CONTRERAS AND ROBIN CONTRERAS HOW SERVED: MAILING WHEN SERVED: 9-10-08 |
|
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned with Service WHAT SERVED:APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT WHO SERVED:SAMUEL CONTRERAS AND ROBIN CONTRERAS HOW SERVED: MAILING WHEN SERVED: 9-10-08 |
|
September 04, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment ISSUED ON 9-4-08 AGAINST SAMUEL CONTRERAS AND ROBIN CONTRERAS |
|
September 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment ISSUED ON 9-4-08 AGAINST SAMUEL CONTRERAS AND ROBIN CONTRERAS |
|
August 18, 2008 | Hearing |
Memo of Costs / Accrued Interest CREDIT: 1400.00 INTEREST:3956.96 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.