Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aiden Hill, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Administration to Creditors | |
July 09, 2021 | Petition Granted | ||
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Publication | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
June 25, 2021 | Petition Granted | ||
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Petition to Administer Estate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.