Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Joseph Schodde, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver Accounting | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver Accounting | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Executor | |
June 11, 2021 | Petition Granted | ||
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Publication | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Petition to Administer Estate | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Will-Codicil | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Subscribing Witness |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.