Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pamela Swahn, Roger Swahn, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution | |
June 18, 2021 | Petition Granted | ||
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Administration | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Administrator | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Service Summons | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Special Administration | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Special Administrator | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Publication | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Letters of Special Administration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.