Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Norman Kuhn, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Petition Granted | ||
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Document Other | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Amended | |
June 11, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Other | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.