Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eden Hirsh, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | |||
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Creditors | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Administration | |
January 08, 2021 | Petition Granted | ||
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Administrator | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof Publication | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Petition to Administer Estate | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Duties Liabilites of Personal Representative | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.