Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kenneth Hall, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated (513210) | ||
November 13, 2020 | Heard: Orders Made | ||
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
October 29, 2020 | Petition Granted | ||
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Supplemental | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Supplemental | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.