Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Elana Pope, Jeannette Adamski-Church, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | S-PR-0009539 Guardianship of Muck, James Jr, Makayla, Savannah Appointment of Successor Guardian Appearance of the parties is required. Motion to Contest Traveling Over Holidays Appearance of the part... | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Other request for order - ex parte 12/5/23 | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Service - Ntc of Unavailability of Counsel to M Collins | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Other of Rejection (eFiling) | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Other Rejection | |
November 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | S-PR-0009539 GUARDIANSHIP OF MUCK [Person] Pre-Trial Conference re Appointment of Successor Guardian – Tier 2 Mediation The appearances of the parties are required for the hearing. Father’s Petition f... | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Report Termination of Guardianship | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Service - Objection to Atty M Collins | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Service - Objection to James Muck |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.