Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tracy Weston, Katharina Rotmann, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Katharina Rotmann, Nichole Torres, George Torres, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Motion Granted (534210) | ||
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Appeal - Trust filed on 04/19/2021 | |
January 22, 2021 | Heard: Taken Under Submission (533410) | ||
January 15, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
January 12, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
January 11, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
January 08, 2021 | Case Assigned | ||
August 17, 2020 | Continued: Court | ||
August 14, 2020 | Continued: Parties (Stipulation) | ||
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.