Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Placer, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Robert Wright, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Support-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Parental Obligations | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Motion | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Document SEALED | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.