Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
County Of Placer, Tylor Barmes, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Bridget Tozer, Tylor Barmes, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Support-Roseville |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail NRPS OUT | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re Payment of Support (DCSS OUT) | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Parental Obligations Includes consolidation with S-FS-0031363. S-FS-0031380 is lead. | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Parental Obligations | |
January 27, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Motion DCSS NOM RE JUDGMENT | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Motion | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations INCLUDES I&E | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer Complaint or Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.