Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lilya Chepurny, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Igor Chepurny, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | |||
July 01, 2022 | |||
January 07, 2022 | |||
August 23, 2021 | Dropped From Calendar: Failure to | ||
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
July 22, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Commissioner | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Court Hearing, Request for Emergency Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.