Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Liliya Chepurny, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Michael Chepurny, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
July 22, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Terminate Restraining Order After Hearing | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Court Hearing, Request for Emergency Orders | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Request for Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.