Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Jon Schexnyder, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kendra Schexnyder, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Change of Address | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Stipulation and Order | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Stipulation Order Child Custody and Visitation | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.