Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marisa Depaulo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Frank Walter, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | |||
June 08, 2021 | |||
May 14, 2021 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
May 14, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Other | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Request for Remote Appearance | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.