Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Julie Hammi, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Ray Hammi, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2022 | |||
September 13, 2022 | |||
September 12, 2022 | |||
September 06, 2022 | |||
August 26, 2022 | Continued: Court | ||
August 26, 2022 | |||
April 15, 2022 | Heard: Trial Date Re-Set | ||
March 29, 2022 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
February 25, 2022 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
February 25, 2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.