Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cesar Barraza, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Melissa Barraza, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | |||
June 06, 2022 | |||
March 22, 2022 | Set in Error | ||
March 22, 2022 | |||
March 02, 2022 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
March 02, 2022 | Referred: Mediation | ||
March 02, 2022 | |||
February 16, 2022 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
January 21, 2022 | Heard: Continued by Parties | ||
January 14, 2022 | Heard: Continued by Parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.